SAINT BENEDICT SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1008247
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2013 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £53.68k £102.21k £119.29k £6.19k £48.90k
Total expenditure £31.20k £136.67k £116.95k £25.36k £123.21k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A