Accounts and annual returns CHILDREN'S LEUKAEMIA SOCIETY
Charity number: 1008634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2020
(These accounts |
19 November 2020 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 09 January 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 09 January 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 13 November 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window