THE PEARS FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1009195
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.93m £18.26m £18.68m £21.19m £22.61m
Total expenditure £16.97m £15.34m £24.59m £20.19m £21.53m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1 £1.48m £976.25k £2.00m £1.00m
Income - Donations and legacies £14.36m £14.05m £18.55m £20.18m £22.47m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £4.00m £0 £1.00m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £562.68k £213.15k £134.64k £8.49k £135.63k
Income - Other £234 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.97m £15.34m £24.59m £20.19m £21.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £628.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £16.32m £14.64m £23.51m £19.57m £20.73m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0