Financial history NATIONAL ECZEMA SOCIETY

Charity number: 1009671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £216.91k £289.22k £430.73k £551.16k £535.71k
Total expenditure £590.55k £493.22k £426.11k £363.52k £384.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £60.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £545.89k £528.13k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £1.81k £1.80k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £2.14k £856
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £1.32k £4.92k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £199.31k £199.31k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £308.81k £351.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £54.69k £12.83k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £2.28k £10.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £15 £19.98k