MARKET HARBOROUGH C OF E SCHOOL P.T.A.

Charity number: 1009734
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £14.66k £15.45k £10.52k £16.85k £7.60k
Total expenditure £14.51k £9.14k £5.96k £5.31k £2.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A