THE JEWISH MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1009819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 July 2020 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 July 2020 154 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 December 2016 On time Download