THE JEWISH MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1009819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.47m £2.65m £2.26m £2.36m £1.97m
Total expenditure £2.56m £2.87m £2.71m £2.66m £2.32m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £235.40k £854.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.85m £1.47m £1.19m £958.04k £56.76k
Income - Other trading activities £273.62k £285.36k £193.21k £263.81k £121.75k
Income - Charitable activities £343.42k £892.84k £879.98k £1.14m £1.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.23k £954 £150 £308 £497
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £125.80k £5.50k £10.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.31m £2.56m £2.47m £2.37m £2.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £252.40k £311.53k £246.87k £285.52k £243.04k
Expenditure - Governance £7.03k £0 £7.00k £0 £12.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0