FRIENDS OF RIVERHOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support and advancement of the Riverhouse Arts Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 March 1992: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF RIVERHOUSE BARN (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kellie Scott | Chair | 09 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roger Doery | Trustee | 14 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
LINDA ANGELA POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.64k | £43.90k | £20.36k | £8.64k | £9.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.04k | £19.77k | £13.95k | £22.15k | £17.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2022 | 332 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH FEBRUARY 1992, AS AMENDED ON 19TH FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE SUPPORT, MAINTENANCE AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE RIVERHOUSE BARN
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, NORTH SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riverhouse Barn Arts Centre
Riverhouse Barn
Manor Road
WALTON-ON-THAMES
Surrey
KT12 2PF
- Phone:
- 01932253354
- Email:
- arts@riverhousebarn.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window