FRIENDS OF GREEN PARK SCHOOL, NEWPORT PAGNELL

Charity number: 1010072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

This partnership of staff, parents, and friends organises social events, as well as raising money for various projects to assist the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £8,932
Total expenditure: £4,252

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Milton Keynes

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRIENDS OF GREEN PARK SCHOOL (Working name)
  • GREEN PARK HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Maclean Chair 12 October 2021
None on record
Jemma Newbold Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record
Liz Clement Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
Suzanne Jackman Trustee 14 October 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.00k £6.18k £3.82k £5.25k £8.93k
Total expenditure £16.04k £3.44k £4.28k £2.18k £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 11 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 30 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 21 November 2020 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Green Park School
Green Park Drive
NEWPORT PAGNELL
Buckinghamshire
MK16 0NH
Phone:
07826849465