THE WESSEX SHIA ITHNA ASHERI JAMAAT

Charity number: 1010076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £245.11k £207.48k £159.73k £265.10k £724.27k
Total expenditure £269.47k £148.23k £132.27k £247.60k £641.71k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.13k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £721.91k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.36k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £641.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0