Accounts and annual returns RYKLOW CHARITABLE TRUST 1992

Charity number: 1010122
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 February 2022 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 April 2020 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required