Financial history RYKLOW CHARITABLE TRUST 1992

Charity number: 1010122
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.15k £21.69k £32.53k £35.42k £27.00k
Total expenditure £45.16k £41.30k £30.01k £29.33k £34.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A