Beacon Hill Academy Association

Charity number: 1010508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2018 03 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2017 23 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2017 Not Required