AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1010556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 31 December 2016 On time Download