Financial history AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1010556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £224.12k £215.13k £270.23k £261.38k £406.06k
Total expenditure £244.24k £234.10k £298.54k £211.72k £278.13k
Income from government contracts £73.63k N/A £75.10k N/A £82.81k
Income from government grants £0 £90.68k N/A N/A £82.81k