Trustees AL-HASANIYA MOROCCAN WOMEN'S PROJECT

Charity number: 1010556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FATIMA MOURAD Chair
None on record
ROISIN BLAKE Trustee 03 March 2022
None on record
Vincenzo Martinelli Trustee 18 February 2022
KITE NETWORK
Received: 57 days late
WASTEAID UK
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF CHARING CROSS HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Ismail Mohammed CHIBA BENNANI Trustee 16 November 2020
None on record
MERIEM AGASSIM Trustee 10 October 2020
None on record
SAEIDA ROUASS Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record