Accounts and annual returns THE DOROTHY EVELYN STONE WILL TRUST

Charity number: 1010626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 September 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window