Governing document THE LEEDS SCHOOLS' SPORTS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 DECEMBER 1920 AS AMENDED 27 JANUARY 1961 AND 15 OCTOBER 1991 AND VARIED BY SCHEME OF 19 APRIL 1995 AND AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE HIGH COURT DATED 11 NOVEMBER 1998 AND AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 20 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST ANY FORM OF ATHLETIC ACTIVITY WHICH TENDS TO IMPROVE THE PHYSIQUE AND MORALS OF THE CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS OF THE CITY (B)TO ENDEAVOUR TO SECURE BETTER FACILITIES FOR PLAYING GAMES IN OPEN SPACES AND TO SECURE ADEQUATE EQUIPMENT FOR ALL GAMES IN ALL SCHOOLS
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF LEEDS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.