DAVENTRY CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in the appreciation of the art and science of music, in all its aspects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 03 June 1992: Standard registration
- DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Humpage | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Noel Heath | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Throssell | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Phelan | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Dawn Jarvill | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL SCOTT | Trustee | 09 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.60k | £6.99k | £18.11k | £14.02k | £46.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.61k | £7.53k | £14.44k | £16.13k | £57.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED 29 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETYãS OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE, TO IMPROVE, TO DEVELOP AND TO MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY, THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE, SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coach House
Lower Catesby
DAVENTRY
Northamptonshire
NN11 6LF
- Phone:
- 07727234235
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window