Accounts and annual returns LONG DITTON TRUST

Charity number: 1010852
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required