FRIENDS OF ASPIN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1011106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required