FRIENDS OF ASPIN SCHOOL

Charity number: 1011106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.02k £21.40k £24.29k £22.01k £2.07k
Total expenditure £14.04k £32.24k £18.61k £24.81k £6.89k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A