Financial history COTTESMORE ST MARY'S RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1011288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £20.95k £9.99k £8.25k £3.17k £0
Total expenditure £10.22k £10.92k £9.26k £3.41k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A