Trustees 5TH BECKENHAM SOUTH SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1011301

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Colville | Chair | 16 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Stroud | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ray Tierney | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Godart-Smith | Trustee | 28 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jones | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Philip Hayes | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Seamus Desmond McLaughlin | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donal Patrick Joseph Mullane | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Martin | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Mark Younge | Trustee | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Andrew Dawe | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Barber | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adam Young | Trustee | 17 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER MARTIN | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JANE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP COLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.