Financial history SOUTH EAST CANCER HELP CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1011509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £226.21k £319.26k £264.46k £241.46k £232.83k
Total expenditure £221.81k £246.14k £255.17k £260.76k £180.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £25.00k