SHREWSBURY HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community association managed by a board of trustees supplying a venue and supported activities for a number of local groups, including young children to the elderly, attending various activities to improve their quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £49,865 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
Governance
- 05 June 1992: Standard registration
- SHREWSBURY HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- SHREWSBURY HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Macdougal | Chair | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Mills | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Vincent Sheath | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Richard Martin | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Halpin | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BELFIELD | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Brockman | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Perrott | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica MacFarlane | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.47k | £146.59k | £203.71k | £196.06k | £229.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.81k | £129.06k | £171.79k | £206.44k | £216.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.33k | £65.37k | £75.47k | £23.00k | £49.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 2018 as amended on 04 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SHREWSBURY HOUSE AREA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH BY ASSOCIATING THE INHABITANTS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND T0 PROVIDE FACILITIES IN INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE IT IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shrewsbury House Community Centre
Bushmoor Crescent
London
SE18 3EG
- Phone:
- 02088543895
- Email:
- admin@shrewsburyhouse.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window