Trustees CHAPELTOWN COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity number: 1011670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Daniel Chair 16 April 2021
None on record
Ewan Povey Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Ashleigh Antonie Jeffers Trustee 20 September 2022
None on record
Amy Curtis Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Rebecca Thompson Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Nikolai berkoff Trustee 12 November 2020
None on record
Lisa Labate Trustee 09 March 2020
None on record
Ruth Matthews Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
Nicholas James Oakshett Trustee 02 July 2019
None on record
Geraldine Montgomerie Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record