Financial history THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1011672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.59m £1.21m £1.90m £878.93k £0
Total expenditure £1.41m £1.46m £1.72m £887.67k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.12m £1.08m £1.30m £834.31k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £460.26k £110.57k £583.52k £40.42k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £5.09k £10.69k £13.48k £1.80k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £6.47k £6.66k £6.54k £2.40k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £54.49k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.10m £1.22m £643.48k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £384.49k £364.54k £504.10k £244.19k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.80k £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A