Trustees THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1011672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caspar MacDonald-Hall Chair 08 May 2000
None on record
Natalie Rebeiz Trustee 28 April 2015
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Michael Steele Trustee 06 January 2014
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
VERNE GRINSTEAD Trustee 16 February 2010
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
HUGH WHITAKER Trustee 19 March 2008
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MARY DAVIS Trustee 19 March 2008
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time
PATRICK GRAFTON GREEN Trustee 19 March 2008
None on record
LAURIE OPPENHEIM Trustee 17 November 2000
THE HONEYPOT CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Received: On time