BHARUCH MUSLIM MEDICAL AND WELFARE TRUST U K

Charity number: 1011781
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 January 2020 89 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 November 2018 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 November 2018 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 03 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 October 2016 On time Download