BHARUCH MUSLIM MEDICAL AND WELFARE TRUST U K

Charity number: 1011781
Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £118.03k £141.86k £145.26k £148.26k £122.09k
Total expenditure £105.03k £130.07k £125.59k £345.09k £8
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A