ROTARY CLUB OF HART TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of the poor and needy or such other charitable purpose, institution, society or object as the Club shall in duly constituted meeting from time to time direct.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Stewart Yule | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Martin Holmes | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL WHATLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC HENDRY SHIMMIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.96k | £36.19k | £56.17k | £32.94k | £38.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.01k | £26.82k | £38.97k | £63.37k | £18.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES INSTITUTION SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST LODGE
BRACKLEY AVENUE
HARTLEY WINTNEY
HOOK
RG27 8QX
- Phone:
- 01252842411
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window