DEAF & HEARING SUPPORT (CAMTAD ND)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deaf an Hearing Support (CAMTAD ND) is a registered charity based in Chesterfield and serves the North Derbyshire Area The aim of the organisation is to strive to ensure deaf and hearing impaired people have the highest possible quality of life, indpendence in daily living activities and full integration into society. Resoure Centre - home visits - advice sessions - training - talks
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 29 June 1992: Standard registration
- 20 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1151502 DEAF AND HEARING SUPPORT
- CAMPAIGN FOR TACKLING ALL DEAFNESS (NORTH DERBYSHIRE) (Previous name)
- CAMPAIGN FOR TACKLING ALL DEAFNESS (NORTHERN DERBYSHIRE) (Previous name)
- CAMTAD N D (Previous name)
- CANTED (N.D.) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.34k | £76.62k | £77.12k | £75.26k | £77.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.24k | £78.54k | £78.23k | £79.91k | £79.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 14 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 14 October 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 11 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 12 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 29 December 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/05/1992 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR PERSONS WITH IMPAIRED HEARING (AND/OR ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS) RESIDENT IN THE NORTHERN DERBYSHIRE AREA AND TO ENSURE THAT SUCH PERSONS HAVE THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE QUALITY OF LIFE,INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING ACTIVITIES AND FULL INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NORTHERN DERBYSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window