ALTRINCHAM AND DISTRICT ASTRONOMICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1012350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 June 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 20 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 08 June 2019 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 01 May 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 26 May 2017 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required