THE CHICKEN SHED THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 1012369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.78m £3.74m £3.56m £3.99m £3.35m
Total expenditure £4.37m £4.30m £3.77m £3.59m £2.92m
Income from government contracts £0 £479.61k N/A £479.15k £493.82k
Income from government grants £0 £2.08k N/A £75.25k £918.63k
Income - Donations and legacies £302.98k £374.19k £402.97k £482.90k £675.31k
Income - Other trading activities £926.52k £940.66k £732.74k £1.15m £6.38k
Income - Charitable activities £2.55m £2.42m £2.42m £2.36m £1.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £96 £91 £319 £703 £690
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £695.22k
Income - Legacies £25.00k £27.04k £0 £57.80k £25.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.24m £3.03m £2.68m £2.49m £2.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.13m £1.19m £1.01m £1.10m £733.31k
Expenditure - Governance £89.35k £64.52k £77.92k £75.74k £73.11k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £85.10k £77.92k £0 £0