THE CHICKEN SHED THEATRE TRUST

Charity number: 1012369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Chris de Pury Trustee 03 December 2020 None on record
MATTHEW SAUL ROSE Trustee 08 November 2011
THE CHICKEN SHED PROPERTY COMPANY Received: On time
Nicholas Luke Millican Trustee 27 June 2019
THE HEALTHWORKERS' SUPPORT FOUNDATION Recently registered
PETE CONSTANTI Trustee 07 June 2016 None on record
Dr LESLEY MAIN Trustee 17 March 2021
THE DORIS HUMPHREY FOUNDATION Received: On time
Aref Hisham Lahham Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
ANTHONY DAVID GIBBON Chair 24 July 2012 None on record
DAME JUDI DENCH CH DBE Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF DRAMA STUDIO LONDON Received: On time
Ashley Muldoon Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
THE HON NATASHA RAYNE Trustee
THE JFR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
CHRISTINE HANSINE MASON BERGER Trustee None on record
Simon Allford Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
JOSH BERGER Trustee 04 May 2012 None on record
James Robert Lock Trustee 27 June 2019 None on record
Martin Gafsen Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Phoebe Vela-Hitchcox Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record
Kathleen Margaret Hall Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
LADY JANE ANTONIA FRANCES RAYNE LACEY Trustee
THE RAYNE FOUNDATION Received: On time
JONATHAN SIGMUND SHALIT Trustee None on record