Governing document UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (DACORUM)
Charity Number: 1012612
Up to date (76 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/03/1991 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/1992 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 04/08/2014 as amended on 02 Aug 2021 as amended on 06 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
The advancement of education, and in particular the education of older people and those retired from full time work, by all means including associated activities conducive to learning and personal development in Dacorum and the surrounding area.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.