THE FRIENDS OF EGERTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1012648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £9.62k £9.39k £8.31k £6.22k £6.29k
Total expenditure £14.99k £5.08k £16.61k £5.73k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A