THE LODGE OF GOOD COMPANIONS NO 7524 MASONIC CHARITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Masonic Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 July 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN ROBERT PLANT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £4.60k | £4.50k | £3.22k | £2.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00k | £2.00k | £3.50k | £3.49k | £2.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITITION DATED 11TH APRIL 1991.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR TO DO SO BY MAKING GRANTS TO THE FOLLOWING MASONIC INSTITUTIONS WHILE THEY REMAIN ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES, NAMELY, THE GRAND CHARITY, THE MASONIC FOUNDATION FOR THE AGED AND THE SICK, THE MASONIC TRUST FOR BOYS AND GIRLS, THE SAMARITAN FUND OF THE ROYAL MASONIC HOSPITAL AND THE MARK BENEVOLENT FUND OR TO ANY OTHER MASONIC OR OTHER INSTITUTION ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Sycamore Crescent
Church Crookham
FLEET
Hampshire
GU51 5NN
- Phone:
- 01252613248
- Email:
- Tim.roberts@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window