1ST ATTLEBOROUGH ST MARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1012900
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 24 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required