THE LUCY FAITHFULL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1013025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.73m £2.23m £2.38m £2.65m £2.97m
Total expenditure £2.60m £2.54m £2.48m £2.67m £2.85m
Income from government contracts £258.82k £14.51k £0 £471.42k £481.38k
Income from government grants £1.22m £749.47k £749.47k £963.79k £1.26m
Income - Donations and legacies £93.40k £166.50k £256.59k £81.56k £114.47k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.63m £2.06m £2.12m £2.56m £2.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.60k £6.49k £2.87k £4.21k £3.16k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £10.00k £4.09k £68.83k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.59m £2.52m £2.46m £2.65m £2.78m
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.82k £26.46k £25.33k £24.61k £66.88k
Expenditure - Governance £104.11k £54.22k £52.69k £58.56k £47.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0