THE LUCY FAITHFULL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1013025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MICHAEL ROBERT MARETT-CROSBY Trustee 13 March 2020 None on record
Dr PAUL MONKS Trustee 05 March 2019 None on record
LESLEY JOY CHAMBERLAIN Trustee 16 September 2019 None on record
Dr Victoria Baines Trustee 12 November 2018 None on record
PROFFESSOR ALEC SPENCER BA HONS MA Trustee 10 December 2008 None on record
PROFESSOR DEREK PERKINS Ph.D. Trustee 31 August 2006 None on record
JILL MASON Trustee 19 March 2021 None on record
JANE LEACH Trustee 05 December 2013 None on record
Dr LYNN CAROLINE SAUNDERS MA CQSW Trustee 18 June 2018
SAFER LIVING FOUNDATION Received: On time
PAUL WEST Trustee 12 December 2011
HOLLAND HOUSE CIO Received: On time
BRITISH POLICE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
BROMSGROVE SCHOOL Received: On time
BROMSGROVE SCHOOL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Dr GOPI RADHA KRISHNAN Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Dr MICHAEL HARRIS Chair 31 August 2006 None on record
MARTIN BREWER Trustee 09 December 2019 None on record
DAVID AIDEN LUNDHOLM Trustee 21 November 2017 None on record