Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE BOURNEMOUTH EYE UNIT

Charity number: 1013029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 April 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 15 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 01 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window