Accounts and annual returns HACKNEY YOUTH ORCHESTRAS TRUST

Charity number: 1013051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 17 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window