Accounts and annual returns GREEK ARCHAEOLOGICAL COMMITTEE (UK)

Charity number: 1013176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 18 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 03 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 09 January 2020 163 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 20 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window