Trustees GREEK ARCHAEOLOGICAL COMMITTEE (UK)

Charity number: 1013176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Georgia Theodoropoulou Chair
None on record
Professor Michael Wood Trustee 23 February 2022
None on record
Joanna Francisca Maria Chantal Bijvoet - Mitropoulos Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
JOHN MICHAEL CARRAS Trustee 01 March 2020
THE ANGLO-HELLENIC LEAGUE
Received: On time
Professor Irini Lemos Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR PANOS ARVANITAKIS Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
Edme Leventis Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
SPYRIDOULA MAKRIS Trustee 20 March 2013
None on record
Zafeiria Ilona Papathanopoulou Trustee 20 February 2013
None on record