Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SOCIETY OF PROSTHODONTICS

Charity number: 1013233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window