THE LIVING WORD TRUST

Charity number: 1013237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.12k £7.81k £10.16k £15.37k £7.99k
Total expenditure £15.42k £8.11k £11.58k £14.72k £7.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A