Accounts and annual returns OXFORDSHIRE MOTOR PROJECT

Charity number: 1013246
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 December 2019 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 December 2019 159 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 July 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 09 July 2018 9 days late Download Open in new window