CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF BUILDING BENEVOLENT FUND LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice, information, practical and financial assistance to past and present members of the Chartered Institute of Building, including their dependant families and members of CIOB staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 July 1992: Standard registration
- THE CIOB BENEVOLENT FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor Patterson | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hill | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Leslie Vowler FCIOB | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean Price Burgess FCIOB | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Olive Mary Gumble | Trustee | 07 August 2019 |
|
|||||
PAUL STEPHEN BAYLEY FCIOB | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KYE GBANGBOLA FCIOB | Trustee | 26 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Roger Gillespie FCIOB | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Garry Mawson FCIOB | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith FCIOB | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.43k | £92.36k | £93.03k | £82.34k | £66.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.40k | £145.65k | £162.49k | £174.96k | £230.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 JUL 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 JUN 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO CONTINUE AND DEVELOP THE CHARITABLE WORK PREVIOUSLY CARRIED ON BY THE INSTITUTE OF COST AND PRODUCTION SURVEYORS BENEVOLENT FUND AND THE LONDON ASSOCIATION OF BUILDERS’ FOREMEN AND CLERKS OF WORK BENEVOLENT FUND AND, THE ASI BENEVOLENT TRUST AND TO CONTINUE AND DEVELOP THE CHARITABLE WORK PREVIOUSLY CARRIED ON BY ANY OTHER FUND WHOSE BENEFICIARIES MAY FALL WITHIN THE CLASS OF BENEFICIARIES COVERED BY THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WHICH ARE THE GRATUITOUS RELIEF BY MEANS OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE OF NEEDY PERSONS WHO:- 3.1.1 ARE FROM TIME TO TIME OR HAVE BEEN CORPORATE OR NON-CORPORATE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE; OR 3.1.2 HAVE AT ANY TIME BEFORE 1ST JANUARY 2003 BEEN EITHER:- (A) MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE OR OF ANY OTHER SOCIETY, ASSOCIATION OR INSTITUTION WITH WHICH THE INSTITUTE AMALGAMATED OR COMBINED PRIOR TO THAT DATE, INCLUDING THE ASI BENEVOLENT TRUST AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES: FACULTY OF ARCHITECTS, CONSTRUCTION SURVEYORS INSTITUTE, BUILDING SURVEYORS INSTITUTE AND THE GUILD OF SURVEYORS, OR (B) MEMBERS ELIGIBLE FOR CONSIDERATION FOR RELIEF FROM THE BODIES KNOWN AS THE INSTITUTE OF COST AND PRODUCTION SURVEYORS BENEVOLENT FUND OR THE LONDON ASSOCIATION OF BUILDERS’ FOREMEN AND CLERKS OF
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chartered Institute Of Building
3 Arlington Square
Downshire Way
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG12 1WA
- Phone:
- 01344630733
- Email:
- assist@ciob.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window